No. 22-174
Title:Gerald E. Groff, Petitioner
v.
Louis DeJoy, Postmaster General
Docketed:August 25, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1900)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 23 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 26, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerald E. Groff
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 26, 2022 to October 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 26, 2022.
Sep 19 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Louis DeJoy, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service
Blanket Consent
Sep 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Brief amici curiae of The Sikh Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of Asma T. Uddin and Steven T. Collis filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of John Kluge filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Thomas More Society and The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Robert P. Roesser & Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Former EEOC General Counsel and Title VII Religious Accommodation Expert filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Religious Liberty Scholars and Employment Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 26 2022Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: Gerald E. Groff
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Louis DeJoy, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service
Other
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W Washington Street
Chicago, IL 60606

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society and The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: John Kluge
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Road
Ste. 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: Robert P. Roesser & Christian Legal Society
Sarah Elizabeth Child
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Madden Black LLP
475 Park Avenue South, Suite 2800
New York, NY 10016

schild@nelsonmaddenblack.com
2123824306
Party name: Members of the United States Congress
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-530-0519
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Steven Timothy Collis
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas Law
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78723

steven.collis@law.utexas.edu
512-475-9090
Party name: Asma T. Uddin and Steven T. Collis
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (“COLPA”) and Other Jewish Organizations
John Archer Meiser
    Counsel of Record
Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Clinic
1338 Biolchini Hall
Notre Dame, IN 46556

jmeiser@nd.edu
574-631-3880
Party name: Religious Liberty Scholars and Employment Law Scholars
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: General Conference of Seventh-day Adventists and Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America
Jonathan Zachary Morris
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave., 8th Fl.
8th Fl.
Burbank, CA 91505

jmorris@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: The Sikh Coalition, Muslim Associates, and The Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team
Rachel Nicole Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Ethics & Public Policy Center
1730 M Street, N.W.
Suite 910
Washington, DC 20036

rmorrison@eppc.org
202-682-1200
Party name: Former EEOC General Counsel and Title VII Religious Accommodation Expert
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 16 Other States
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute