No. 22-172 | |
Title: | Swisher International, Inc., Petitioner v. Trendsettah USA, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | August 24, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-56016) |
Decision Date: | April 15, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 25, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 22 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2022 to October 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 21, 2022. |
Sep 22 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 21 2022 | Brief of respondents Trendsettah USA, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 08 2022 | Reply of petitioner Swisher International, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 09 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022. |
Dec 05 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 333 South Grand Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90071 tboutrous@gibsondunn.com | (213) 229-7000 |
Party name: Swisher International, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Eric F. Citron Counsel of Record | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. 7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 Bethesda, MD 20814 ec@goldsteinrussell.com | (301) 362-0636 |
Party name: Trendsettah USA, Inc., et al. | ||
Other | ||
John Mercer Masslon II Counsel of Record | Washington Legal Foundation 2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20036 jmasslon@wlf.org | (202) 588-0302 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation |