No. 22-167
Title:Daniel J. Van Linn, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:August 23, 2022
Linked with 21A728
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2019AP1317-CR)
   Decision Date:March 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2022Application (21A728) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2022 to August 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2022Application (21A728) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 19, 2022.
Aug 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent Wisconsin to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Fourth Amendment Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Daniel J. Van Linn
Attorneys for Respondent
John W. KellisWisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

kellisjw@doj.state.wi.us
608-266-7081
Party name: State of Wisconsin
Other
Max Michel Carter-Oberstone
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

mcarter-oberstone@orrick.com
415-773-5539
Party name: Fourth Amendment Legal Scholars