No. 22-166
Title:Geraldine Tyler, Petitioner
v.
Hennepin County, Minnesota, et al.
Docketed:August 23, 2022
Linked with 21A712
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3730)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Application (21A712) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2022 to August 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
May 13 2022Application (21A712) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 10, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Application (21A712) to extend further the time from August 10, 2022 to August 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Written Request
Jul 28 2022Application (21A712) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 19, 2022.
Aug 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Hennepin County, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 09 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Geraldine Tyler
Blanket Consent
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2022Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2022)
Sep 20 2022Brief amici curiae of David C. Wilkes, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Realtors Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 20, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of PioneerLegal, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2022Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute and the Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christina Marie Martin
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd., Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

cmartin@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Geraldine Tyler
Attorneys for Respondents
Rebecca Lee Stark Holschuh
    Counsel of Record
Hennepin County Attorney's Office
300 South Sixth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55487

rebecca.holschuh@hennepin.us
6123484797
Party name: Hennepin County, et al.
Other
David C. Wilkes
    Counsel of Record
Herman Katz Cangemi Wilkes & Clyne, LLP
1407 Broadway
Suite 4002
New York, NY 10018

dwilkes@hermankatz.com
(212) 953-5000
Party name: David C. Wilkes, et al.
Robert Daniel Alt
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye lnstitute
88 East Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

robert@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: Buckeye Institute and the Competitive Enterprise Institute
Laura Elizabeth Dougherty
    Counsel of Record
Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Foundation
921 11th Street, Suite 1201
Sacramento, CA 95814

laura@hjta.org
916-444-9950
Party name: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Thomas David Larson
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Realtors Association
4801 Forest Run Road
Madison, WI 53704

tlarson@wra.org
6082120066
Party name: Wisconsin Realtors Association
William Alvarado Rivera
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street, NW,
Washington, DC 20049

warivera@aarp.org
7037480717
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Stephanie Schuster
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

stephanie.schuster@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: PioneerLegal, LLC