No. 22-163
Title:Lenair Moses, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 23, 2022
Linked with 21A700
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-4067)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2022Application (21A700) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 21, 2022 to August 20, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 11 2022Application (21A700) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 20, 2022.
Aug 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 19 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2022Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Lenair Moses, aka Bones
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute