No. 22-149
Title:Rosalie Weisfeld, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Scott, Texas Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:August 17, 2022
Linked with 21A789
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50774)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 02 2022Application (21A789) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2022 to August 13, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2022Application (21A789) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 13, 2022.
Aug 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Waiver of right of respondents John Scott, Texas Secretary of State to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 27 2022Response Requested. (Due October 27, 2022)
Oct 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 27, 2022 to December 26, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Dec 27 2022Brief of respondents John Scott, Texas Secretary of State, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2023Reply of petitioners Rosalie Weisfeld, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Hani Mirza
    Counsel of Record
Texas Civil Rights Project
1405 Montopolis Drive
Austin, TX 78741

hani@texascivilrightsproject.org
(512) 474-5073
Party name: Rosalie Weisfeld, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: John Scott, et al.