No. 22-148
Title:Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc., Petitioner
v.
VIP Products LLC
Docketed:August 17, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-16969)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 16, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 16, 2022 to October 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 17, 2022.
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Campbell Soup Company filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constellation Brands, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amici curiae of American Craft Spirits Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of the International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Levi Strauss & Co. and Patagonia Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 17 2022Brief of respondent VIP Products LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2022Reply of petitioner Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 21 2022Petition GRANTED.
Nov 28 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Dec 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 16, 2023.
Jan 11 2023Brief of petitioner Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of NIKE, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of American Craft Spirits Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Motion Picture Association, Inc. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Scholars, Former Judges, and Former Government Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Campari America LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constellation Brands, Inc filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Levi Strauss & Co., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Campbell Soup Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Brief amici curiae of American Apparel & Footwear Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 22, 2023.
Feb 03 2023Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Ninth Circuit.
Feb 03 2023All records from the USCA-9th Circuit are available on PACER. Sealed records from the USDC-Arizona were transmitted electronically.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Jack Daniel's Properties, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Bennett Evan Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright PLLC
1850 N. Central Ave., Ste. 1400
Phoenix, AZ 85004

bcooper@dickinsonwright.com
6022855044
Party name: VIP Products LLC
Other
Megan Kathleen Bannigan
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
66 Hudson Boulevard
New York, NY 10001

MKBANNIGAN@DEBEVOISE.COM
(212) 909-6000
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors and Adjunct Professors
William G. Barber
    Counsel of Record
Pirkey Barber PLLC
1801 E. 6th Street
Suite 300
Austin, TX 78702

bbarber@pirkeybarber.com
(512) 482-5223
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

cbartolomucci@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Campbell Soup Company
Edward Tuck Colbert
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

ecolbert@huntonak.com
2026623010
Party name: Constellation Brands, Inc
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Gregory S. Gilchrist
    Counsel of Record
Verso Law Group LLP
209 Kearny St., 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94108

greg.gilchrist@versolaw.com
415-534-0495
Party name: Levi Strauss & Co. and Patagonia Inc.
Adam Wolff Hofmann
    Counsel of Record
Hanson Bridgett LLP
425 Market Street, 26th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

AHOFMANN@HANSONBRIDGETT.COM
415-777-3200
Party name: Scholars, Former Judges, and Former Government Officials
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: American Craft Spirits Association, American Distilled Spirits Alliance, The Beer Institute, The Brewers Association, Distilled Spirits Council of the United States, and the Wine Institute
Susan J. Kohlmann
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1155 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

SKOHLMANN@JENNER.COM
212-891-1690
Party name: Motion Picture Association, Inc.
Eric Robert Moran
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff LLP
300 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

MORAN@MBHB.COM
3129133302
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
John Paul O'Herron
    Counsel of Record
ThompsonMcMullan, P.C.
100 Shockoe Slip, Third Floor
Richmond, VA 23219

joherron@t-mlaw.com
8046986253
Party name: American Apparel & Footwear Association, Footwear Distributors & Retailers of America, Council of Fashion Designers of America, and The Accessories Council
Stanley Joseph Panikowski III
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
401 B Street, Suite 1700
San Diego, CA 92101

stanley.panikowski@us.dlapiper.com
619-699-2643
Party name: NIKE, Inc.
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert Joseph Rando
    Counsel of Record
Greenspoon Marder LLP
590 Madison Avenue
18th Floor
New York, NY 10022

ROBERT.RANDO@GMLAW.COM
2125245006
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Vijay Kumar Toke
    Counsel of Record
Rimon P.C.
423 Washington Street
Suite 600
San Francisco, CA 94111

vijay.toke@rimonlaw.com
415-683-5472
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6000
Party name: Campari America LLC