No. 22-138
Title:Billy Raymond Counterman, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:August 11, 2022
Linked with 21A873
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(17CA1465)
   Decision Date:July 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 11, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2022Application (21A873) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 29 2022Application (21A873) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 9, 2022.
Aug 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 12, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2022 to October 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 12, 2022.
Sep 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Billy Raymond Counterman
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado
Other
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute