No. 22-136
Title:Roy Charles Brooks, et al., Appellants
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:August 11, 2022
Linked with 22A83
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(3:21-CV-259-DCG-JES-JVB, 1:21-CV-991-LY-JES-JVB)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2022Application (22A83) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from August 1, 2022 to September 30, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Application (22A83) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 8, 2022. See Rules 18.3, 30.2.
Aug 08 2022Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due September 12, 2022)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2022 to October 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Chad Wilson Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Brazil & Dunn
4407 Bee Caves Rd.
Austin, TX 78746

chad@brazilanddunn.com
512-717-9822
Party name: Roy Charles Brooks, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Greg Abbott, et al.