No. 22-132
Title:Carlos Ruben Ruiz, Petitioner
v.
Massachusetts
Docketed:August 10, 2022
Linked with 21A731
Lower Ct:Appeals Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(20-P-775)
   Decision Date:November 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 17, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2022Application (21A731) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 15, 2022 to August 12, 2022, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 17 2022Application (21A731) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until August 12, 2022.
Aug 08 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.
Sep 19 2022Response Requested. (Due October 19, 2022)
Sep 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 19, 2022 to December 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Carlos Ruben Ruiz
Attorneys for Respondent
Anna E. Lumelsky
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

anna.lumelsky@mass.gov
617-963-2334
Party name: Massachusetts