No. 22-124
Title:Brett C. Kimberlin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 9, 2022
Linked with 21A773
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1691)
   Decision Date:January 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:March 9, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 26 2022Application (21A773) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2022 to August 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 31 2022Application (21A773) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 6, 2022.
Aug 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2022 to October 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2022.
Sep 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Rights Behind Bars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOtherOther
Oct 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2022 to November 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 10, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Brett C. Kimberlin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Samuel David Kinder Weiss
    Counsel of Record
Rights Behind Bars
416 Florida Ave., NW # 26152
Washington, DC 20001

sam@rightsbehindbars.org
(202) 455-4399
Party name: Rights Behind Bars