No. 22-1238
Title:Office of the United States Trustee, Petitioner
v.
John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3203)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2023)
Proof of ServicePetition
Jul 24 2023Brief of respondents John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 09 2023Reply of petitioner Office of the United States Trustee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 17 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Office of the United States Trustee.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 09 2023Brief of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit.
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 9, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Professionals in Taxation in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 11 2023Brief of respondents John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Acadiana Management Group, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of MF Global Holdings LTD filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of USA Sales, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Bankruptcy Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Reply of petitioner Office of the United States Trustee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2024Argued. For petitioner: Masha G. Hansford, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Office of the United States Trustee
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2801 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 2300
Dallas, TX 75201

DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM
303-382-6219
Party name: John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, et al.
Nicholas Jay ZlutickyStinson LLP
1201 Walnut, Suite 2900
Kansas City, MO 64106

nicholas.zluticky@stinson.com
8166913278
Party name: John Q. Hammons Fall 2006, LLC, et al.
Other
A. Lavar Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Taylor Nelson Amitrano LLP
1900 Main Street
Suite 650
Irvine, CA 92614

ltaylor@taylorlaw.com
714-546-0445
Party name: USA Sales, Inc.
Christopher John DiPompeo
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

cdipompeo@jonesday.com
202-879-7686
Party name: MF Global Holdings LTD
Bradley Loy Drell
    Counsel of Record
Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell, APLC
2001 MacArthur Dr.
Alexandria, LA 71301

bdrell@goldweems.com
3186191830
Party name: Acadiana Management Group, LLC
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

RENGLERT@KRAMERLEVIN.COM
202-775-4500
Party name: FORMER BANKRUPTCY JUDGES
Steven Paul Lehotsky
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
200 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

steve@lkcfirm.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Heather Michelle MathewsGold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell
2001 MacArthur Drive
Alexandria, LA 71301

hmathews@goldweems.com
318-445-6471
Party name: Acadiana Management Group, LLC
Kyle Oliver Sollie
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1717 Arch Street
Suite 3100
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ksollie@reedsmith.com
2158518852
Party name: Institute for Professionals in Taxation