No. 22-123
Title:University of Toledo, Petitioner
v.
Jaycee Wamer
Docketed:August 9, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4219)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2022 to October 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 11, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Brief amici curiae of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2022Waiver of University of Toledo of the 14-day waiting period submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: University of Toledo
Attorneys for Respondent
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-339-8497
Party name: Jaycee Wamer
Other
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Attorney General's Office
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: States of Utah, Alabama, Florida, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, and Texas