No. 22-1225 | |
Title: | Jason Payne, Petitioner v. Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. |
Docketed: | June 21, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-5154) |
Decision Date: | March 21, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 16 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 21, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2023. |
Aug 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 5, 2023. |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief for respondents Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. |
Oct 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. |
Oct 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023. |
Nov 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. |
Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. |
Nov 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023. |
Dec 01 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Christopher E. Mills Counsel of Record | Spero Law LLC 557 East Bay Street #22251 Charleston, SC 29413 cmills@spero.law | 8436060640 |
Party name: Jason Payne | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Biden, Joseph R., et al. |