No. 22-1219 | |
Title: | Relentless, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Department of Commerce, et al. |
Docketed: | June 16, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1886) |
Decision Date: | March 16, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 29 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2023 to August 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 16, 2023. |
Jul 17 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and the Defense of Freedom Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 17 2023 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2023 to September 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2023. |
Sep 15 2023 | Brief of respondents U.S. Department of Commerce, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
John Julian Vecchione Counsel of Record | The New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th St. NW Suite 450 Washington, DC 20036-2411 john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com | 2029186902 |
Party name: Relentless, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: U.S. Department of Commerce, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Boulevard Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 TOM@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | 7032439423 |
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and the Defense of Freedom Institute | ||
John Marc Wheat Counsel of Record | Advancing American Freedom, Inc. et amici 801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 930 Washington, DC 20004-2729 MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM | (202) 780-4848 |
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc. |