No. 22-1218
Title:Wendy Smith, et al., Petitioners
v.
Keith Spizzirri, et al.
Docketed:June 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16051)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 04 2023Response Requested. (Due September 5, 2023)
Sep 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 5, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 5, 2023.
Oct 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 5, 2023 to November 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 6, 2023.
Oct 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2023 to December 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 4, 2023.
Dec 04 2023Brief of respondents Keith Spizzirri, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 21 2023Reply of petitioners Wendy Smith, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition GRANTED.
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 22, 2024.
Feb 21 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Feb 26 2024Brief of petitioners Wendy Smith, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024CIRCULATED
Mar 27 2024Brief of respondents Keith Spizzirri, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2024Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 10 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit on March 6, 2024. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Apr 12 2024Reply of petitioners Wendy Smith, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2801 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 2300
Dallas, TX 75201

DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM
303-382-6219
Party name: Wendy Smith, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

JROSENKRANZ@ORRICK.COM
212-506-5380
Party name: Keith Spizzirri, et al.
Laurent R. G. BadouxLittler Mendelson
2425 E. Camelback Road
Phoenix, AZ 85016

LBadoux@littler.com
(602)-474-3600
Party name: Keith Spizzirri, et al.
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
333 Washington Street
suite 850
Boston, MA 02108

brobbins@newenglandlegal.org
6176953660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
2026175620
Party name: American Association for Justice