No. 22-1216
Title:Dwayne Ferguson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 16, 2023
Linked with 22A760
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6733)
   Decision Date:November 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2023Application (22A760) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2023 to May 26, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2023Application (22A760) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 26, 2023.
May 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 02 2023Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2023)
Aug 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2023 to October 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 2, 2023.
Sep 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2023 to November 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 6, 2023.
Nov 01 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Reply of petitioner Dwayne Ferguson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Ave.
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

WOLFMANB@GEORGETOWN.EDU
202-661-6582
Party name: Dwayne Ferguson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America