No. 22-121
Title:ML Genius Holdings LLC, Petitioner
v.
Google LLC, et al.
Docketed:August 9, 2022
Linked with 21A757
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3113)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 19 2022Application (21A757) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 8, 2022 to August 7, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2022Application (21A757) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 7, 2022.
Aug 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2022)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, ML Genius Holdings LLC
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022, for all respondents.
Sep 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Open Markets Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2022Brief of respondents Google LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2022Reply of petitioner ML Genius Holdings LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Dec 12 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: ML Genius Holdings LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Google LLC
Brian Michael WillenWilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Google LLC
Other
Stephen Michael Doniger
    Counsel of Record
Doniger / Burroughs
603 Rose Avenue
Venice, CA 90022

stephen@donigerlawfirm.com
3105901820
Party name: Open Markets Institute
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Digital Justice Foundation