No. 22-1199
Title:Rogan O'Handley, Petitioner
v.
Shirley N. Weber, California Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:June 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15071)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2023Waiver of right of respondent Shirley N. Weber, California Secretary of State to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 28 2023Waiver of right of respondent X Corp. (fka Twitter Inc.) to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Justin Hart and Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jul 26 2023Response Requested. (Due August 25, 2023)
Aug 16 2023Motion of Shirley N. Weber, California Secretary of State to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2023 to September 25, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2023Motion of X Corp. (fka Twitter Inc.) to extend the time to file a response from August 25, 2023 to September 25, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 17 2023The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including September 25, 2023, for all respondents.
Aug 25 2023Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief of respondents Shirley N. Weber, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Brief of respondent X Corp. (fka Twitter Inc.) in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

TAYLOR@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
703-243-9423
Party name: Rogan O'Handley
Attorneys for Respondents
Anna Theresa FerrariCalifornia Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94102

anna.ferrari@doj.ca.gov
4155103779
Party name: Shirley N. Weber, California Secretary of State
Ari Benjamin Asher Holtzblatt
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

ARI.HOLTZBLATT@WILMERHALE.COM
(202) 663-6964
Party name: X Corp. (fka Twitter Inc.)
Mica Louise Moore
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013

Mica.Moore@doj.ca.gov
5714239517
Party name: Shirley N. Weber, California Secretary of State
Other
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
M. E. Buck Dougherty III
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

BDOUGHERTY@LIBERTYJUSTICECENTER.ORG
312-637-2280
Party name: Justin Hart and Liberty Justice Center
Rory Thomas GrayAlliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Rd. NE, Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

RGRAY@ADFLEGAL.ORG
770-339-0774
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Free Speech Coalition, Free Speech Def. and Ed. Fund, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Fdn., Gun Owners of Calif., Tenn. Firearms Assoc., Public Advocate of the U.S., U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Def. Fund, and Conservative Legal Def. and Ed. Fund
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom