No. 22-118
Title:Marquis Shaw, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 8, 2022
Linked with 21A747
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50384)
   Decision Date:March 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2022Application (21A747) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2022 to August 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 20 2022Application (21A747) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 1, 2022.
Aug 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2022 to October 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 7, 2022.
Sep 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 7, 2022.
Nov 07 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2022Reply of petitioner Marquis Shaw filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Dec 08 2022Rescheduled.
Dec 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 03 2023Rescheduled.
Jan 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 18 2023Letter of respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Goldberger
    Counsel of Record
50 Rittenhouse Place
Ardmore, PA 19003

peter.goldberger@verizon.net
610-649-8200
Party name: Marquis Shaw
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States