No. 22-1178
Title:Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Yonas Fikre
Docketed:June 6, 2023
Linked with 22A822
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35904)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2023Application (22A822) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2023 to June 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2023Application (22A822) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 2, 2023.
Jun 02 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2023.
Aug 21 2023Brief of respondent Yonas Fikre in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2023Reply of petitioners Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 13 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 30 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 8, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 01 2023Sealed material from the United States District Court for the District of Oregon electronically available with the Clerk.
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondent Yonas Fikre filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Sikh Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Asian Americans Advancing Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Patrick G. Eddington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Reply of petitioners Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 08 2024Argued. For petitioners: Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Gadeir Abbas, Washington, D. C.
Feb 21 2024Letter of Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Bureau of Investigation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gadeir Ibrahim AbbasCouncil on American-Islamic Relations
453 New Jersey Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

gabbas@cair.com
202 742-6420
Party name: Yonas Fikre
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHARRISON@JENNER.COM
(202)-639-6865
Party name: Yonas Fikre
Lena Fatina MasriCAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

ldf@cair.com
12027426420
Party name: Yonas Fikre
Justin Mark SadowskyCAIR Legal Defense Fund
453 New Jersey Ave SE
Washington, DC 20003

jsadowsky@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Yonas Fikre
Other
Koren Larissa Bell
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
2029 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067

KBell@willkie.com
(310) 855-3000
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice and Other Asian-American Civil Rights Organizations
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Patrick G. Eddington
Joseph Charles Davis
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

jdavis@becketlaw.org
202-796-0204
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Russell Harris Falconer
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

rfalconer@gibsondunn.com
(214) 698-3301
Party name: Cato Institute
Samuel Bracken Gedge
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

SGEDGE@IJ.ORG
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street, Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JHUEBERT@ljc.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Christina A. Jump
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Law Center for Muslims In America
100 North Central Expy, Suite 1010
Richardson, TX 75080

CJUMP@CLCMA.ORG
(972) 914-2507
Party name: Constitutional Law Center for Muslims in America
John Michael Reeves Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Reeves Law LLC
7733 Forsyth Blvd.
Suite 1100 - #1192
St. Louis, MO 63105

reeves@appealsfirm.com
3147756985
Party name: Sikh Coalition and First Liberty Institute
Hina Shamsi
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

hshamsi@aclu.org
212-549-2500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and The ACLU Foundation of Oregon
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

MPS@SUBBLAW.COM
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc. and the Forum for Constitutional Rights