No. 22-1165 | |
Title: | Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, et al., Petitioners v. Moab Partners, L.P., et al. |
Docketed: | June 1, 2023 |
Linked with 22A920 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-2524) |
Decision Date: | December 20, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 27, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 14 2023 | Application (22A920) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 27, 2023 to May 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 24 2023 | Application (22A920) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 30, 2023. |
May 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 16 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Barclays Capital Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 3, 2023 to August 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2023. |
Jul 03 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 03 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 2, 2023 to August 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 11, 2023. |
Aug 11 2023 | Brief of respondent Moab Partners, L.P. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 28 2023 | Reply of petitioners Macquarie Infrastructure Corp., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Aug 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Linda T. Coberly Counsel of Record | Winston & Strawn, LLP 35 West Wacker Drive Chicago, IL 60601 LCOBERLY@WINSTON.COM | 312-558-5600 |
Party name: Macquarie Infrastructure Corp., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
David C. Frederick Counsel of Record | Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C. 1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400 Washington, DC 20036-3209 DFREDERICK@KELLOGGHANSEN.COM | 202-326-7900 |
Party name: Moab Partners, L.P. | ||
William Thomas Marks Counsel of Record | Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP 2001 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20006 wmarks@paulweiss.com | 202-223-7314 |
Party name: Barclays Capital Inc. | ||
Other | ||
William McGinley Jay Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter, LLP 1900 N Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM | 2023464190 |
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America | ||
Lyle Roberts Counsel of Record | Shearman & Sterling LLP 401 9th Street, NW Suite 800 Washington, DC 20004 lyle.roberts@shearman.com | 202 508-8108 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation |