No. 22-115
Title:Micheal W. Buckner, as Trustee of the United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States Pipe & Foundry Co., et al.
Docketed:August 5, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-13832)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 29 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States Pipe & Foundry Co., LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Response Requested. (Due October 7, 2022)
Sep 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022.
Nov 07 2022Brief of respondents United States Pipe & Foundry Co., LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2022Reply of petitioners Micheal W. Buckner, as Trustee of the United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.
Dec 12 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bryan Michael Killian
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20004

Bryan.killian@morganlewis.com
2023736191
Party name: Micheal W. Buckner, as Trustee of the United Mine Workers of America Combined Benefit Fund, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: United States Pipe & Foundry Co., LLC, et al.