No. 22-1125 | |
Title: | Don Blankenship, Petitioner v. NBCUniversal, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | May 18, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1198, 22-1207, 22-1326) |
Decision Date: | February 22, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 15 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 13 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Boston Globe Media Partners LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 13 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents NBCUniversal, LLC; CNBC, LLC; Fox News Network, LLC; Cable News Network, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 20 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 05 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Jul 11 2023 | Response Requested. (Due August 10, 2023) |
Jul 19 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2023 to August 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2023, for all respondents. |
Aug 21 2023 | Brief of respondents NBCUniversal, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 01 2023 | Reply of petitioner Don Blankenship filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Oct 02 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Eric Peter Early Counsel of Record | Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP 6420 Wilshire Blvd. 17th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90048 EEARLY@EARLYSULLIVAN.COM | 3233014660 |
Party name: Don Blankenship | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kevin Taylor Baine Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 680 Maine Avenue, SW Washington, DC 20024 kbaine@wc.com | 202-434-5011 |
Party name: NBCUniversal, LLC; CNBC, LLC; Fox News Network, LLC; Cable News Network, Inc., et al. | ||
Andrew Martin Buttaro | Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP One Federal Street Boston, MA 02110-1726 andrew.buttaro@morganlewis.com | 617-341-7743 |
Party name: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC | ||
Jonathan M. Albano Counsel of Record | Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP One Federal Street Boston, MA 02110 jonathan.albano@morganlewis.com | 617-341-7700 |
Party name: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC | ||
Other | ||
William Jeffrey Olson Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180 WJO@MINDSPRING.COM | 703 356 5070 |
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al. |