No. 22-111
Title:United States, ex rel. Thomas Proctor, Petitioner
v.
Safeway, Inc.
Docketed:August 5, 2022
Linked with 21A861
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3425)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2022Application (21A861) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2022 to August 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 30 2022Application (21A861) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until August 3, 2022.
Aug 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2022 to October 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 6, 2022.
Sep 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 6, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 7, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
(202) 629-3530
Party name: Thomas Proctor
Attorneys for Respondent
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-389-5191
Party name: Safeway, Inc.