No. 22-1079 | |
Title: | Truck Insurance Exchange, Petitioner v. Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | May 5, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1858) |
Decision Date: | February 14, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Anthony J. Casey, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 21 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Jul 07 2023 | Response Requested. (Due August 7, 2023) |
Jul 18 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 7, 2023 to September 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 19 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 5, 2023, for all respondents. |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief of respondents Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief of respondent Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 19 2023 | Reply of petitioner Truck Insurance Exchange filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. |
Oct 13 2023 | Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
Nov 16 2023 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Nov 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 7, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 17, 2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Allyson Ho Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 2001 Ross Avenue Suite 2100 Dallas, TX 75201 AHO@GIBSONDUNN.COM | (214) 698-3100 |
Party name: Truck Insurance Exchange | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Edwin John Harron Counsel of Record | Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP 1000 North King Street Wilmington, DE 19801 eharron@ycst.com | 3025716703 |
Party name: Future Claimants' Representative | ||
Kevin C. Maclay Counsel of Record | Caplin and Drysdale, Chartered One Thomas Circle, NW Suite 1100 Washington, DC 20005 KMACLAY@CAPDALE.COM | 202-862-7841 |
Party name: Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants | ||
Charles Kevin Marshall Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20001 ckmarshall@jonesday.com | 2028793851 |
Party name: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. and Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. | ||
Mark A. Nebrig | Moore & Allen PLLC 100 North Tryon Street Suite 4700 Charlotte, NC 28202 marknebrig@mvalaw.com | 704-331-1000 |
Party name: Lehigh Hanson | ||
James Leeland Patton Jr. | Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP Rodney Square Wilmington, DE 19801 jpatton@ycst.com | 302-571-6600 |
Party name: Future Claimants' Representative | ||
Other | ||
Caroline Cook Lindsay Counsel of Record | Hilgers Graben PLLC 332 S Michigan Avenue, Suite 121 #5612 Chicago, IL 60604 CLINDSAY@HILGERSGRABEN.COM | 5039392833 |
Party name: Anthony J. Casey, et al. |