No. 22-1078
Title:Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Sherman Nealy, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13232)
   Decision Date:February 27, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2023Brief amici curiae of Krystina L. Cavazos, et al. filed
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Recording Industry Association of America and National Music Publishers’ Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief of respondents Sherman Nealy, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jun 21 2023Reply of petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether, under the discovery accrual rule applied by the circuit courts and the Copyright Act's statute of limitations for civil actions, 17 U. S. C. §507(b), a copyright plaintiff can recover damages for acts that allegedly occurred more than three years before the filing of a lawsuit.
Oct 24 2023Motion for an extension of time file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al.
Main Document
Oct 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 24, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 5, 2024.
Nov 06 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 27 2023Brief of petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Tyler T. Ochoa in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Southwestern Law Student Krystina Cavazos, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Publishers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Recording Industry Association of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of McHale & Slavin, P.A. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 21, 2024.
Jan 05 2024Brief of Sherman Nealy, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 09, 2024--Corrected PDF and hard copy served on 1/5/24.)
Jan 05 2024Brief of respondents Sherman Nealy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit.
Jan 09 2024Partial record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Jan 10 2024Record received from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of Former Register of Copyrights Ralph Oman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Brief amici curiae of The Authors Guild, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Society of Entertainment & Arts Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 05 2024Reply of petitioners Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2024Argued. For petitioners: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Joe Wesley Earnhardt, New York, N. Y.; and Yaira Dubin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Warner Chappell Music, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joe Wesley Earnhardt
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

WEarnhardt@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Chelsea Ann LewisLewis Law PLLC
8201 Peters Road, Suite 1000
Plantation, FL 33324

chelsea@lewislawesq.com
954-869-8456
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Robert Allen RosenbergThe KLK Law Firm (Of Counsel)
8751 W Broward Blvd Ste. 105
Plantation, FL 33324

grebnesor1942@gmail.com
9545404713
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Antony L. RyanCravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

aryan@cravath.com
212-474-1296
Party name: Sherman Nealy, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael BarclayElectronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

michael@eff.org
4154369333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries
Nicole Bergstrom
    Counsel of Record
Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz, PC
28 Liberty Street, 35th Floor
New York, NY 10005

nbergstrom@fkks.com
(212) 980-0120
Party name: Association of American Publishers
Scott Alan Burroughs
    Counsel of Record
Doniger / Burroughs
247 Water Street
First Floor
New York, NY 10038

SCOTT@DONIGERLAWFIRM.COM
310-590-1820
Party name: National Society of Entertainment & Arts Lawyers
Benjamin Hans Diessel
    Counsel of Record
Wiggin and Dana LLP
One Century Tower, 265 Church Street
New Haven, CT 06510

bdiessel@wiggin.com
203-498-4304
Party name: The Authors Guild, Inc., The Dramatists Legal Defense Fund, The Graphic Artists Guild, The Romance Writers of America, The Songwriters Guild of America, Inc. and the Textbook & Academic Authors Association
Michael Meredith Epstein
    Counsel of Record
Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School
3050 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90010

amicusproject@swlaw.edu
2137386774
Party name: Southwestern Law Student Krystina Cavazos, Brynn Bodair, Orly avid, Robert C. Lind, and Michael Epstein
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

ELAINE.GOLDENBERG@MTO.COM
202-220-1114
Party name: Recording Industry Association of America and National Music Publishers’ Association
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

VLEVY@HSGLLP.COM
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Former Register of Copyrights Ralph Oman
Andrew David Lockton
    Counsel of Record
McHale & Slavin, P.A.
2855 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

alockton@mchaleslavin.com
561-625-6575
Party name: McHale & Slavin, P.A.
Tyler Trent Ochoa
    Counsel of Record
Santa Clara University School of Law
500 El Camino Real
Santa Clara, CA 95053

ttochoa@scu.edu
4085542765
Party name: Tyler T. Ochoa
Benjamin James Siders
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Rice LLC
600 Washington Avenue
Suite 2500, MO 63101

bsiders@lewisrice.com
314-444-7805
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Mitchell Leff Stoltz
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy St
San Francisco, CA 94109

mitch@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Authors Alliance, American Library Association an Association of Research Libraries
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America