No. 22-1074
Title:George Sheetz, Petitioner
v.
County of El Dorado, California
Docketed:May 4, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(C093682)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 1, 2023
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 02 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
May 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2023 to July 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2023.
Jun 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2023Brief amicus curiae of Texas Public Policy Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of California Building Industry Association and National Association of Home Builders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2023Brief of respondent County of El Dorado, California in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2023Reply of petitioner George Sheetz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioner George Sheetz filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2023Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 9, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Building Industry Association of the Greater Valley filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of California Building Industry Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Bay Area Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Realtors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of California Housing Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Citizen Action Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Hotel Des Arts, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Planning Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Record requested from the Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District.
Nov 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Charles Gardner, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Record received from the Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondent County of El Dorado, California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Brief amici curiae of City And County Of San Francisco, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Clean Water Agencies, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 29 2023Reply of petitioner George Sheetz filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 09 2024Argued. For petitioner: Paul J. Beard, II, Los Angeles, Cal. For respondent: Aileen M. McGrath, San Francisco, Cal.; and Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
453 S. Spring Street
Suite 400-1458
Los Angeles, CA 90013

PAUL.BEARD@FISHERBROYLES.COM
818-216-3988
Party name: George Sheetz
Brian Trevor HodgesPacific Legal Foundation
1425 Broadway, #429
Seattle, WA 98122

BHodges@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: George Sheetz
Lawrence G. SalzmanPacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

LSALZMAN@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
9164197111
Party name: George Sheetz
Damien Michael SchiffPacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DSCHIFF@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
(916) 419-7111
Party name: George Sheetz
Attorneys for Respondent
Aileen Marie McGrath
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
100 Pine Street
Suite 3200
San Francisco, CA 94111

AMcGrath@akingump.com
415-765-9553
Party name: County of El Dorado, California
Glen Calvin HansenAbbott & Kindermann, Inc.
2100 21st Street, Ste. A
Sacramento, CA 95818

ghansen@aklandlaw.com
9164569595
Party name: County of El Dorado, California
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Cato Institute
Braden Heath Boucek
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 West Crossville Road
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075

bboucek@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and Beacon Center of Tennessee
Emily Lowther BroughZacks, Freedman & Patterson PC
601 Montgomery St., Suite 400
San Francisco, CA 94111

emily@zfplaw.com
(415) 956-8100
Party name: Hotel Des Arts, LLC; San Francisco Apartment Association; California Apartment Association; and Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute
Jay Randall Carson
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

j.carson@buckeyeinstitute.org
614-224-4422
Party name: Buckeye Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Brian J. Connolly
    Counsel of Record
University of Michigan
701 Tappan Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

cobrian@umich.edu
7347638636
Party name: American Planning Association
Douglas J. DenningtonRutan & Tucker LLP
18575 Jamboree Road
9th Floor
Irvine, CA 92612

DDENNINGTON@RUTAN.COM
(714) 641-5100
Party name: California Building Industry Association and National Association of Home Builders
Alexandra Dapolito Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
700 K. St. N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

alexandra.dunn@bakerbotts.com
2026391324
Party name: National Association of Clean Water Agencies and Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Blaine Ian Green
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

blaine.green@pillsburylaw.com
(415) 983-1000
Party name: Charles Gardner and Emily Hamilton, Ph.D.
Kristen Ann Jensen
    Counsel of Record
Office of the San Francisco City Attorney
1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, City Hall, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94102-4682

kristen.jensen@sfcityatty.org
4153101103
Party name: City And County Of San Francisco, et al.
Brett Spencer Jolley
    Counsel of Record
McKinley Conger Jolley & Galarneau, LLP
3031 W. March Lane
Suite 230
Stockton, CA 95219

bjolley@mcjglaw.com
209-477-8171
Party name: Building Industry Association of the Greater Valley
David Paul Lanferman
    Counsel of Record
Rutan & Tucker, LLP
455 Market Street, Suite 1870
San Francisco, CA 94105

DLANFERMAN@RUTAN.COM
650-263-7900
Party name: California Building Industry Association and National Association of Home Builders
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

JMARWELL@VELAW.COM
202-639-6507
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jackson Wilder Maynard Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Citizen Action Defense Fund
111 21st Ave SW
Ste. 13
Olympia, WA 98501

jackson@citizenactiondefense.org
8505193495
Party name: Citizen Action Defense Fund
Jayson Alan ParsonsRutan & Tucker LLP
18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor
Irvine, CA 92612

jparsons@rutan.com
(714) 641-5100
Party name: California Building Industry Association and National Association of Home Builders
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

JOSH.PATASHNIK@DOJ.CA.GOV
619-738-9628
Party name: State of California
Andrew W. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
396 Hayes Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

schwartz@smwlaw.com
415-552-7272
Party name: California State Association of Counties, League of California Cities, and California Special Districts Association
Brett A. Shumate
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave. N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

BSHUMATE@JONESDAY.COM
7036470319
Party name: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS®, AMERICAN PROPERTY OWNERS ALLIANCE, REALTORS® LAND INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS®, AND CALIFORNIANS FOR HOMEOWNERSHIP
Thomas Samuel Silverstein
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

TSILVERSTEIN@LAWYERSCOMMITTEE.ORG
(202) 662-8600
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the Public Interest Law Project
Darren Seiji Teshima
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
415 Mission St, 54th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

dteshima@cov.com
(415) 591-7094
Party name: California Housing Defense Fund, California YIMBY, and Yes In My Back Yard
Robert H. Thomas
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Ste 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

RTHOMAS@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Katharine Tracy Van Dusen
    Counsel of Record
Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP
One Montgomery Street, Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94104

ef-ktv@cpdb.com
415-391-4800
Party name: Bay Area Council
Chance Dean Weldon
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Ave.
Austin, TX 78701

CWELDON@TEXASPOLICY.COM
5124722700
Party name: Texas Public Policy Foundation
Andrew M. Zacks
    Counsel of Record
Zacks & Freedman, PC
601 Montgomery Street
Suite 400
San Francisco, CA 94111

AZ@ZFPLAW.COM
(415) 956-8100
Party name: Hotel Des Arts, LLC; San Francisco Apartment Association; California Apartment Association; and Small Property Owners of San Francisco Institute