No. 22-1071 | |
Title: | Washington Alliance of Technology Workers, Petitioner v. Department of Homeland Security, et al. |
Docketed: | May 4, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-5028) |
Decision Date: | October 4, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 1, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 01 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 11 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 26 2023 | Motion of United States Department of Homeland Security, et al. for an extension of time submitted. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
John Michael Miano Counsel of Record | Immigration Reform Law Institute 25 Massachusetts Ave. NW Suite 335 Washington, DC 20001 MIANO@COLOSSEUMBUILDERS.COM | (202) 232-5590 |
Party name: Washington Alliance of Technology Workers | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States Department of Homeland Security, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Lawrence S. Ebner Counsel of Record | Atlantic Legal Foundation 1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org | 202-729-6337 |
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation |