No. 22-1053
Title:ABKCO Music, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
William Sagan, et al.
Docketed:May 1, 2023
Linked with 22A756
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3816, 20-4020,-20-4099)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2023Application (22A756) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 26, 2023 to March 28, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 22 2023Application (22A756) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 28, 2023.
Mar 09 2023Application (22A756) to extend further the time from March 28, 2023 to April 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 15 2023Application (22A756) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 27, 2023.
Apr 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2023 to June 14, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 14, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: ABKCO Music, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael S. Elkin
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

melkin@winston.com
212-294-6729
Party name: William Sagan, et al.