No. 22-105 | |
Title: | Coinbase, Inc., Petitioner v. Abraham Bielski |
Docketed: | August 3, 2022 |
Linked with 22A91, 22A92 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-15566) |
Decision Date: | July 11, 2022 Rule 12.4 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 29 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 2, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 29 2022 | Application (22A91) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 29 2022 | Application (22A92) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 29 2022 | Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Aug 04 2022 | Response to application (22A91) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 5 p.m. (ET) on Monday, August 8, 2022. |
Aug 04 2022 | Response to application (22A92) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 5 p.m. (ET) on Monday, August 8, 2022. |
Aug 04 2022 | Respondents are directed to respond to the motion to expedite consideration by 5 p.m. (ET) on Monday, August 8, 2022. |
Aug 08 2022 | Response to motion to expedite from respondent Abraham Bielski filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 08 2022 | Response to application (22A91) from respondent Abraham Bielski filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 08 2022 | Letter in response to application (22A92) received from respondents David Suski, et al. |
Main Document | |
Aug 08 2022 | Letter in response to motion to expedite received from respondents David Suski, et al. |
Main Document | |
Aug 09 2022 | Reply of applicant Coinbase, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 10 2022 | Motion to expedite consideration filed by petitioner DENIED. |
Aug 10 2022 | Application (22A91) referred to the Court. |
Aug 10 2022 | Application (22A92) referred to the Court. |
Aug 10 2022 | Application (22A91) denied by the Court. |
Aug 10 2022 | Application (22A92) denied by the Court. |
Aug 23 2022 | Waiver of right of respondents David Suski, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 02 2022 | Brief of respondent Abraham Bielski in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 20 2022 | Reply of Coinbase, Inc. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted) (September 20, 2022) |
Sep 20 2022 | Reply of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022. |
Sep 29 2022 | Response Requested. (Due October 31, 2022) |
Oct 31 2022 | Brief of respondents David Suski, et al. in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 11 2022 | Reply of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 15 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/2/2022. |
Nov 17 2022 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 29 2022 | Supplemental brief of respondent Abraham Bielski filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 30 2022 | Supplemental brief of respondents David Suski, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022. |
Dec 05 2022 | Letter from petitioner received. |
Main Document | |
Dec 09 2022 | Petition GRANTED. |
Jan 20 2023 | Brief of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 20 2023 | Joint appendix Volume I & II filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 24 2023 | Letter of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. regarding proceedings in the CA-9 Circuit filed. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Jan 25 2023 | Letter of respondent Abraham Bielski regarding proceedings in the CA-9 Circuit filed. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of National Retail Federation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Civil Justice Association of California filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 27 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy filed. (February 22, 2023 - corrected brief and PDF). (Distributed) |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 31 2023 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 21, 2023. |
Feb 03 2023 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Ninth Circuit. |
Feb 03 2023 | All records from the USCA-9th Circuit and USDC-ND California are available on PACER. |
Feb 13 2023 | CIRCULATED |
Feb 15 2023 | Letter of petitioner notifying the Court of the Ninth Circuit's deferral of appeal in No. 22-15566, pending this Court's decision in Coinbase, Inc. v. Bielski, filed. (Distributed) |
Main Document | |
Feb 21 2023 | Brief of respondent Abraham Bielski filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 21 2023 | Brief of respondents David Suski, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 27 2023 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 01 2023 | Suggestion of mootness as to Coinbase, Inc. v. Suski, et al., filed by respondent Abraham Bielski. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Mar 06 2023 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents DENIED. |
Mar 07 2023 | Response to suggestion of mootness as to Coinbase, Inc. v. Suski, et al., filed by petitioner Coinbase, Inc.. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Mar 09 2023 | Reply of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 10 2023 | Notice of withdrawal of his suggestion of mootness as to Coinbase, Inc. v. Suski, et al, filed by respondent Abraham Bielski. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 13 2023 | Response to suggestion of mootness from respondents Suski et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Mar 21 2023 | Argued. For petitioner: Neal K. Katyal, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Hassan A. Zavareei, Washington, D. C. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 Thirteenth St., N.W. Washington, DC 20004 neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | 202 637 5528 |
Party name: Coinbase, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
David John Harris Jr. Counsel of Record | Finkelstein & Krinsk LLP 501 West Broadway, Suite 1260 San Diego, CA 92101 djh@classactionlaw.com | (619) 238-1333 |
Party name: David Suski, et al. | ||
Hassan Ali Zavareei Counsel of Record | Tycko & Zavareei LLP 2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 1010 Washington, DC 20006 hzavareei@tzlegal.com | 202.973.0900 |
Party name: Abraham Bielski | ||
Other | ||
Cory L. Andrews Counsel of Record | Washington Legal Foundation 2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 CANDREWS@WLF.ORG | 2025880302 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation | ||
Lawrence S. Ebner Counsel of Record | Atlantic Legal Foundation 1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org | 202-729-6337 |
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation | ||
Karla Ann Gilbride Counsel of Record | Public Justice, P.C. 1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630 Washington, DC 20036 KGILBRIDE@PUBLICJUSTICE.NET | 2027978600 |
Party name: Public Justice | ||
Brianne Jenna Gorod Counsel of Record | Constitutional Accountability Center 1200 18th Street, NW Suite 501 Washington, DC 20036 BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG | 202 296 6889 |
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center | ||
Deepak Gupta Counsel of Record | Gupta Wessler PLLC 2001 K Street NW Suite 850 North Washington, DC 20006 DEEPAK@GUPTAWESSLER.COM | (202) 888-1741 |
Party name: American Association for Justice | ||
Fred J. Hiestand Counsel of Record | Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation 3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1 Sacramento, CA 95817 FRED@FJH-LAW.COM | 9164485100 |
Party name: Civil Justice Association of California | ||
Mark Andrew Perry Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP 2001 M Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 MARK.PERRY@WEIL.COM | (202) 682-7000 |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center | ||
Andrew John Pincus Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM | 202-263-3220 |
Party name: National Retail Federation | ||
Jason D. Russell Counsel of Record | Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher and Flom LLP 300 South Grand Avenue 34th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071 JASON.RUSSELL@SKADDEN.COM | 213-687-5000 |
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. | ||
Sarah Elizabeth Spencer Counsel of Record | Christensen & Jensen 257 East 200 South, Suite 1100 Salt Lake City, UT 84111 SARAH.SPENCER@CHRISJEN.COM | 8013235000 |
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy |