No. 22-1033
Title:Eugene Mazo, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tahesha Way, New Jersey Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:April 25, 2023
Linked with 22A725
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2630)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2023Application (22A725) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 21, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 13 2023Application (22A725) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 23, 2023.
Mar 09 2023Application (22A725) to extend further the time from March 23, 2023 to April 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Mar 15 2023Application (22A725) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 22, 2023.
Apr 21 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2023Amicus brief of Professor Michael R. Dimino, Sr. not accepted for filing. (May 24, 2023) (Corrected efiling to be submitted)
May 23 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael R. Dimino, Sr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 25 2023Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey Secretary of State, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 25 2023Amicus brief of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2023Amicus brief of Michael D. Byrne submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2023Amicus brief of New Jersey Professors of Law and Politics submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2023Amicus brief of Good Government Coalition of New Jersey and RepresentUS of New Jersey submitted.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
May 25 2023Amicus brief of Derek T. Muller submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2023Amicus brief of Liberty Justice Center; Manhattan Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Eugene Mazo, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08625

JEREMY.FEIGENBAUM@NJOAG.GOV
609-376-2690
Party name: New Jersey Secretary of State, et al.
Other
Lori Outzs Borgen
    Counsel of Record
Seton Hall Law School
Center for Social Justice
833 McCarter Highway
Newark, NJ 07102

lori.borgen@shu.edu
973-642-8700
Party name: Good Government Coalition of New Jersey and RepresentUS of New Jersey
Riddhi Dasgupta
    Counsel of Record
Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave NW, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20001

sdasgupta@taftlaw.com
2026641564
Party name: Professor Michael R. Dimino, Sr.
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th St. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

MFRANCISCO@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
202-857-1722
Party name: Derek T. Muller
Stephen Ralph Klein
    Counsel of Record
Barr & Klein PLLC
1629 K St NW Ste 300
Washington, DC 20006

steve@barrklein.com
202-804-6676
Party name: Michael D. Byrne
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: New Jersey Professors of Law and Politics
Daniel Moshe Ortner
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
510 Walnut St.
Suite 1250.
Philadelphia, PA 19106

daniel.ortner@thefire.org
(215) 717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 North Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

JSCHWAB@LIBERTYJUSTICECENTER.ORG
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center; Manhattan Institute