No. 22-1025
Title:Sylvia Gonzalez, Petitioner
v.
Edward Trevino, II, et al.
Docketed:April 24, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50276)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2023Waiver of right of respondents Edward Trevino, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 08 2023Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center and Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of Fane Lozman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2023Response Requested. (Due June 14, 2023)
May 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2023Brief of respondents Edward Trevino, II, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of Texas Public Policy Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 27 2023Reply of petitioner Sylvia Gonzalez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 21 2023Supplemental brief of petitioner Sylvia Gonzalez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2023Supplemental brief of respondents Edward Trevino, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 23 2023Motion for an extension of time filed (see amended motion of 11/7/23).
Main Document
Nov 07 2023Amended motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 11, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 24, 2024.
Dec 11 2023Brief of petitioner Sylvia Gonzalez filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Fane Lozman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The National Police Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Brief of respondents Edward Trevino, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Sheriffs’ Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 20, 2024.
Jan 30 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Alaska, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jan 31 2024Brief amicus curiae of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Brief amici curiae of Texas Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 08 2024Record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas and available with the Clerk.
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anya Aleksandrovna Bidwell
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd.
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

ABIDWELL@IJ.ORG
7036829320
Party name: Sylvia Gonzalez
William Robert AroninInstitute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

waronin@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Sylvia Gonzalez
Patrick Michael JaicomoInstitute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

PJAICOMO@IJ.ORG
7036829320
Party name: Sylvia Gonzalez
Marie Leora MillerInstitute for Justice
3200 N. Central Ave.
Suite 2160
Phoenix, AZ 85012

mmiller@ij.org
951-816-0455
Party name: Sylvia Gonzalez
Attorneys for Respondents
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Edward Trevino, et al.
Scott Michael TschirhartDenton Navarro Rodriguez Bernal Santee & Zech, PC
2500 W. William Cannon Drive, Suite 609
Austin, TX 78745

smtschirhart@rampagelaw.com
512-279-6431
Party name: Edward Trevino, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Charles Harker Rhodes IV
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

harker.rhodes@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Local Government Legal Center, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Kimberly Dawn Rodgers
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Department of Law
1031 W. Fourth Ave., Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

kimber.rodgers@alaska.gov
907 269 6612
Party name: Alaska, et al.
Easha Anand
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

EANAND@STANFORD.EDU
(650) 724-3345
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

brejcha@aol.com
3127821680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Brennan Tyler BrooksThomas More Society
309 W. Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

btb@btylerbrookslawyer.com
336-707-8855
Party name: Thomas More Society
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bruce.brown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Gregory Charles Champagne
    Counsel of Record
St. Charles Parish Sheriff's Office
260 Judge Edward Dufresne Parkway
Luling, LA 70070

SheriffGC@stcharlessheriff.org
985-783-2883
Party name: National Sheriffs’ Association
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

DDEBOLD@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Law Enforcement Action Partnership
Vera Eidelman
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

VEIDELMAN@ACLU.ORG
2125492500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center and Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

AMETLITSKY@OMM.COM
212-326-2000
Party name: Fane Lozman
Aaron Lloyd Nielson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC-059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

aaron.nielson@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Texas Association of Counties and Major County Sheriffs of America
Michel Paradis
    Counsel of Record
Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt & Mosle
101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178

mparadis@curtis.com
1.212.696.6078
Party name: Law Professors
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

DEVI.RAO@MACARTHURJUSTICE.ORG
202-869-3490
Party name: Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The National Police Accountability Project
Chance Dean Weldon
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Ave.
Austin, TX 78701

CWELDON@TEXASPOLICY.COM
5124722700
Party name: Texas Public Policy Foundation