No. 22-1020 | |
Title: | H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P., Petitioner v. Unicolors, Inc. |
Docketed: | April 20, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-56253, 18-56548) |
Decision Date: | November 10, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 18, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 10 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Unicolors, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 16 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023. |
Jun 05 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Peter K. Stris Counsel of Record | Stris and Maher LLP 777 S. Figueroa Street Suite 3850 Los Angeles, CA 90017 PSTRIS@STRIS.COM | 2139956800 |
Party name: H&M Hennes & Mauritz, LP | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Scott Alan Burroughs Counsel of Record | Doniger / Burroughs APC 603 Rose Avenue Venice, CA 90291 SCOTT@DONIGERLAWFIRM.COM | 3105901820 |
Party name: Unicolors, Inc. |