No. 22-1019
Title:CoreCivic, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Sylvester Owino, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:April 20, 2023
Linked with 22A767
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55221)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2023Application (22A767) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 20, 2023 to April 19, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 24 2023Application (22A767) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 19, 2023.
Apr 18 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2023Waiver of right of respondent Sylvester Owino, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM
202-637-3377
Party name: CoreCivic, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU
202-661-6728
Party name: Sylvester Owino, et al.
Other
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
Gateway Plaza
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

MFITZGERALD@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
804-775-4716
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc.