No. 22-1008
Title:Corner Post, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Docketed:April 17, 2023
Linked with 22A783
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1639)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2023Application (22A783) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 14, 2023 to April 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 08 2023Application (22A783) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 13, 2023.
Apr 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2023 to June 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2023.
May 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of John Kendrick filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2023Brief of respondent Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve Sytem in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 16 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received.
Main Document
Jun 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jun 23 2023Reply of petitioner Corner Post, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 26 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Corner Post, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioner Corner Post, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Governor Henry McMaster, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Little Tucker Act Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors Aditya Bamzai, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute (Dec.12, 2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondent Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve Sytem filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Small Business Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 20, 2024.
Jan 05 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 12 2024Reply of petitioner Corner Post, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit (one box) and available with the Clerk.
Feb 20 2024Argued. For petitioner: Bryan K. Weir, Arlington, Va. For respondent: Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
222 S. Main Street
5th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

TYLER@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Corner Post, Inc.
Bryan Kipp WeirConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

bryan@consovoymccarthy.com
2027255032
Party name: Corner Post, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve Sytem
Other
Aditya Bamzai
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

abamzai@law.virginia.edu
434-243-0698
Party name: Professors Aditya Bamzai and John Duffy
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

BERRY@BOYDENGRAYASSOCIATES.COM
2029550620
Party name: John Kendrick
Jeremy Joseph Broggi
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

JBROGGI@WILEY.LAW
(202) 719-7000
Party name: Cato Institute
Michael Blandford Buschbacher
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street NW, Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

mbuschbacher@boydengray.com
(202) 955-0620
Party name: Little Tucker Act Scholars
Caleb Joseph Kruckenberg
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd, Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22201

CKRUCKENBERG@PACIFICLEGAL.ORG
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
William Grayson Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
South Carolina State House
1100
Columbia, SC 29201

glambert@governor.sc.gov
8037342100
Party name: Governor Henry McMaster and The South Carolina Department of Labor, Licensing & Regulation
Elizabeth Gaudio Milito
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Inc.
555 12th Street, NW
Suite 1001
Washington, DC 20004

elizabeth.milito@nfib.org
(202) 406-4443
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc.
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
4201 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 1000
Arlington, VA 22203

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP
2001 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

MARK.PERRY@WEIL.COM
(202) 682-7000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Skye Lynn Perryman
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

sperryman@democracyforward.org
(202) 383-0794
Party name: SMALL BUSINESS ASSOCIATIONS
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rich.samp@ncla.legal
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Nicolas Anthony Sansone
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

nsansone@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

LINDSAY.S.SEE@WVAGO.GOV
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 17 Other States