No. 22-1006
Title:Prime Insurance Company, Petitioner
v.
Darnell Wright
Docketed:April 17, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1002)
   Decision Date:January 13, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2023)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2023 to June 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2023.
May 17 2023Amicus brief of Trucking Industry Defense Association submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

ZACK.TRIPP@WEIL.COM
(202) 682-7000
Party name: Prime Insurance Company
Attorneys for Respondent
David Arthur Singleton
    Counsel of Record
Blackburn Romey
4203 W. Jefferson Blvd.
Fort Wayne, IN 46804

DSINGLETON@BLACKBURNROMEY.COM
2604224400
Party name: Darnell Wright
Adina H. RosenbaumPublic Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

AROSENBAUM@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-7720
Party name: Darnell Wright
Other
Meghan Eileen Ruesch
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Wagner, LLP
1411 Roosevelt Avenue, Suite 102
Indianapolis, IN 46201

MRUESCH@LEWISWAGNER.COM
317-237-0500
Party name: Trucking Industry Defense Association