No. 22-1005
Title:Cornelius L. Emily, et al., Petitioners
v.
Christopher Welters
Docketed:April 17, 2023
Linked with 22A792
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A20-1481)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 03 2023Application (22A792) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 14, 2023 to April 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 09 2023Application (22A792) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 13, 2023.
Apr 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Association of Minnesota Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Patrick Goodwin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1400
St. Paul, MN 55101

MICHAEL.GOODWIN@AG.STATE.MN.US
651.757.1456
Party name: Cornelius Emily, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Zorislav Romanovich Leyderman
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Zorislav R. Leyderman
222 South 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

ZRL@ZRLLAW.COM
6128766626
Party name: Chistopher Welters
Other
Richard Duane Hodsdon
    Counsel of Record
Richard Hodsdon Law Office
2435 White Pine Way
Stillwater, MN 55082-0000

RICK_HODSDON@YAHOO.COM
6514915900
Party name: Minnesota Sheriffs Association
Vicki Ann Hruby
    Counsel of Record
Jardine, Logan and O'Brien, PLLP
8519 Eagle Point Blvd.,
Lake Elmo, MN 55042

VHRUBY@JLOLAW.COM
6512907411
Party name: Association of Minnesota Counties
Rebecca Jennifer KrystosekRamsey County Attorney's Office
121 7th Place East, Suite 4500
Saint Paul, MN 55101

rebecca.krystosek@co.ramsey.mn.us
6512663128
Party name: Minnesota County Attorneys Association
Robert Britt Roche
    Counsel of Record
Ramsey County Attorney's Office
121 Seventh Place East, Suite 4500
St. Paul, MN 55101

ROBERT.ROCHE@CO.RAMSEY.MN.US
6512663230
Party name: Minnesota County Attorneys Association