No. 22-100
Vide 22-97, 22-98, 22-99
Title:Fairholme Funds, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:August 2, 2022
Linked with 21A711
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1912, 2020-1914)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Application (21A711) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 12 2022Application (21A711) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 22, 2022.
Jul 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Aug 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2022 to October 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 3, 2022.
Sep 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Fairholme Funds, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States