No. 22-10 | |
Title: | David Fox Dubin, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | July 5, 2022 |
Linked with 21A694 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-50912) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 05 2022 | Application (21A694) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2022 to July 31, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 11 2022 | Application (21A694) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 1, 2022. |
Jun 30 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 27 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2022 to September 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 6, 2022. |
Aug 02 2022 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 8, 2022. |
Sep 08 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 28 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022. |
Sep 28 2022 | Reply of petitioner David Dubin filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 24 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022. |
Oct 31 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022. |
Nov 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022. |
Nov 10 2022 | Petition GRANTED. |
Dec 08 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, David Dubin |
Blanket Consent | |
Dec 19 2022 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 27, 2023. |
Dec 20 2022 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Fifth Circuit. |
Dec 23 2022 | Brief of petitioner David Dubin filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 23 2022 | Joint appendix filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 27 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Joel S. Johnson filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 29 2022 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 29 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 30 2022 | Record from the U.S.C.A.-5th Circuit is available on PACER. |
Jan 04 2023 | Record received from the U.S.D.C.-Western District of Texas. Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted electronically. |
Jan 17 2023 | CIRCULATED |
Jan 23 2023 | Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 16 2023 | Reply of petitioner David Dubin filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 27 2023 | Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Stanford, Cal. For respondent: Vivek Suri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey L. Fisher Counsel of Record | Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clini 559 Nathan Abbott Way Stanford, CA 94305 jlfisher@law.stanford.edu | (650) 724-7081 |
Party name: David Dubin | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Other | ||
Andrew Lee Adler Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender's Office One East Broward Blvd. Suite 1100 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 andrew_adler@fd.org | 9543567436 |
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders | ||
Henry W. Asbill Counsel of Record | Buckley LLP 2001 M St. NW Suite 500 Washington, DC 20036 hasbill@buckleyfirm.com | 202-349-8000 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers | ||
Joel Stephen Johnson Counsel of Record | Pepperdine Caruso School of Law 24255 E. Pacific Coast Hwy. Malibu, CA 90263 joel.johnson@pepperdine.edu | 3105067531 |
Party name: Professor Joel S. Johnson |