No. 21A585 | |
Title: | Modern Sportsman, LLC, et al., Applicants v. United States |
Docketed: | April 6, 2022 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1107) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 04 2022 | Application (21A585) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 3, 2022 to July 2, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2022 | Application (21A585) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 2, 2022. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Patrick Strawbridge Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC Ten Post Office Square 8th Floor South PMB #706 Boston, MA 02109 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com | 2075223163 |
Party name: Modern Sportsman, LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |