No. 21A217 | |
Title: | John Doe, et al., Applicants v. San Diego Unified School District, et al. |
Docketed: | December 10, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-56259) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 10 2021 | Application (21A217) for an injunction, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Dec 10 2021 | Response to application (21A217) requested by Justice Kagan, due Thursday, December 16, 2021, by 3 p.m. |
Dec 16 2021 | Response to application from respondent San Diego Unified School District, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 17 2021 | Reply of applicants John Doe, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Dec 23 2021 | Letter dated December 23, 2021 from counsel for applicants filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 26 2021 | Letter dated December 26, 2021 from counsel for respondents filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 04 2022 | Letter dated January 4, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 14 2022 | Letter dated January 14, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 11 2022 | Letter dated February 11, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 18 2022 | Application (21A217) referred to the Court. |
Feb 18 2022 | Application (21A217) denied by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is denied in light of changed circumstances. Because respondents have delayed implementation of the challenged policy, and because they have not settled on the form any policy will now take, emergency relief is not warranted at this time. Applicants’ alternative request for a writ of certiorari before judgment and a stay pending resolution is denied for the same reason. The Court’s denial is without prejudice to applicants seeking a new injunction if circumstances warrant. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Paul Michael Jonna Counsel of Record | LiMandri & Jonna LLP 16236 San Dieguito Road, Suite 3-15 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 pjonna@limandri.com | 8587599930 |
Party name: John Doe, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Mark Robert Bresee Counsel of Record | Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Rudd & Romo 4275 Executive Square, Suite 700 La Jolla, CA 92037 mbresee@aalrr.com | 9492947439 |
Party name: San Diego Unified School District, et al. |