No. 21-993
Title:Willard Anthony, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:January 12, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-KA-372)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 12, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 08 2022Response Requested. (Due March 10, 2022)
Feb 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 10, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2022.
Apr 08 2022Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 04 2022Record Requested.
May 23 2022Record received from the Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fifth District. The record is electronic and contains sealed materials.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 13 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Letty Spring Di Giulio
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Letty S. Di Giulio
1055 St. Charles Avenue
Suite 208
New Orleans, LA 70130

letty@lettydigiulio.com
5045715929
Party name: Willard Anthony
Attorneys for Respondent
Juliet L. Clark
    Counsel of Record
Assistant District Attorney
200 Derbigny Street
Gretna, LA 70053

jclark@jpda.us
(504)-368-1020
Party name: Louisiana