No. 21-984
Title:Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael J. Hewitt
Docketed:January 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20023)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 27 2022Letter of January 25, 2022 pertaining to the corporate discosure statement, received from counsel for the petiitoners.
Main Document
Feb 07 2022Letter of February 7, 2022 pertaining to amicus briefs, received from counsel for the petiitoners.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Michael J. Hewitt to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas Oil and Gas Association, Inc. and The American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Independent Petroleum Association of America and Offshore Operators Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Mississippi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 18 2022Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2022)
Mar 21 2022Brief of respondent Michael J. Hewitt in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2022Reply of petitioners Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 06 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 26 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022May 26, 2022 motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 8, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2022.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, October, 12, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 5th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Edwin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Oberti Sullivan LLP
712 Main Street, Suite 900
Houston, TX 77002

ed@osattorneys.com
(713) 401-3557
Party name: Michael J. Hewitt
Other
David Bryce Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
1301 McKinney Street, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010

djordan@littler.com
7136524784
Party name: Texas Oil and Gas Association, Inc. and The American Petroleum Institute
Robert P. Lombardi
    Counsel of Record
The Kullman Firm, P.L.C.
1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600
New Orleans, LA 70163

rpl@kullmanlaw.com
504-524-4162
Party name: Independent Petroleum Association of America and Offshore Operators Committee
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: States of Mississippi, et al.