No. 21-975
Title:Idaho, Petitioner
v.
Aaron James Howard
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(47367)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 17 2022Response Requested. (Due April 18, 2022)
Apr 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2022 to June 17, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 17, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth K. Jorgensen
    Counsel of Record
Off of Attny Gen - State of ID
Statehouse Room 210
P.O. Box 83720
Boise, ID 83720-0010

ken.jorgensen@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-2400
Party name: Idaho
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric Don Fredericksen
    Counsel of Record
ldaho State Appellate Public Defender
322 East Front Street, Suite 570
Boise, ID 83702

efredericksen@sapd.state.id.us
208-334-2712
Party name: Aaron James Howard