No. 21-972
Title:Thomas H. Buffington, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veteran Affairs
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Linked with 21A113
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1479)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2021Application (21A113) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 4, 2021 to December 6, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Application (21A113) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 6, 2021.
Nov 22 2021Application (21A113) to extend further the time from December 6, 2021 to January 3, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Application (21A113) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 3, 2022.
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2022 to March 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2022.
Feb 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Veterans for America Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and the National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Senators Tom Cotton, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Cramer, and Ted Cruz filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 8, 2022.
Apr 08 2022Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 26 2022Reply of petitioner Thomas H. Buffington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 05 2022Rescheduled.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 17 2022Rescheduled.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 24 2022Rescheduled.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
May 31 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 07 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 16 2022Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 21 2022Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: Thomas H. Buffington
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veteran Affairs
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy, National Organization of Veterans’ Advocates, Paralyzed Veterans of America, The Veterans of Foreign Wars, and Vietnam Veterans of America
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Arizona, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas, Utah, and Virginia
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Cato Institute and the National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
(202) 261-3378
Party name: Senators Tom Cotton, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Cramer, and Ted Cruz
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Concerned Veterans for America Foundation