No. 21-970
Title:Scott Crow, Director, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Karl Fontenot
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7045)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:October 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Waiver of right of respondent Karl Fontenot to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 01 2022Response Requested. (Due March 3, 2022)
Feb 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2022 to May 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2022.
May 02 2022Brief of respondent Karl Fontenot in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2022Reply of petitioner Scott Crow filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

caroline.hunt@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Scott Crow
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian Marc Pomerantz
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Brian M. Pomerantz
P.O. Box 853
Carrboro, NC 27510

habeas@protonmail.com
323-630-0049
Party name: Karl Fontenot