No. 21-908
Title:Kate Marie Bartenwerfer, Petitioner
v.
Kieran Buckley
Docketed:December 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-60021, 20-60023, 20-60024)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 20, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Kieran Buckley to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 19 2022Response Requested. (Due February 18, 2022)
Jan 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2022 to March 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Brief of respondent Kieran Buckley in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 17 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Kieran Buckley
Blanket Consent
Jun 01 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kate Bartenwerfer
Blanket Consent
Jun 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 19, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 22, 2022.
Jul 19 2022Brief of petitioner Kate Bartenwerfer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2022Brief amici curiae of The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robert E. Zuckerman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 22 2022Brief of respondent Kieran Buckley filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 29 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 29 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Lawrence Ponoroff, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Oct 18 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 6, 2022.
Oct 24 2022Reply of petitioner Kate Bartenwerfer filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2022CIRCULATED.
Oct 28 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Dec 06 2022Argued. For petitioner: Sarah M. Harris, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Zachary D. Tripp, Washington, D. C.; and Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Kate Bartenwerfer
Sarah Michelle HarrisWilliams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Kate Bartenwerfer
Iain Angus MacdonaldMacdonald\Fernandez LLP
221 Sansome Street, 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

iMac@macfern.com
(415) 362-0449
Party name: Kate Bartenwerfer
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7220
Party name: Kieran Buckley
Janet Marie BrayerLaw Offices of Janet Brayer
P.O. Box 954
Moss Beach, CA 94038

janet@brayer.net
415-286-4400
Party name: Kieran Buckley
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Kathryn M. Davis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Kathryn M. Davis
530 S. Lake Ave.
No. 425
Pasadena, CA 91101

kathryn.davis@kmdavislaw.com
2132200846
Party name: Robert E. Zuckerman
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Professors Lawrence Ponoroff and Rafael I. Pardo
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
David Kuney Law
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: The Hon. Judith Fitzgerald (Ret.),, et al.
Peter Vincent Marchetti
    Counsel of Record
Thurgood Marshall School of Law
3100 Cleburne Street
Houston, TX 77004

peter_marchetti@hotmail.com
(617) 270-3143
Party name: Law Professors
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center
1501 The Alameda
Suite 200
San Jose, CA 95126

tara.twomey@comcast.net
831-229-0256
Party name: National Consumer Bankruptcy Rights Center and Professor Angela K. Littwin