No. 21-896
Vide 21-6661
Title:Jimmy Martin, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Alonzo Cortez Johnson
Docketed:December 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5091)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2022Brief of Alonzo Cortez Johnson in opposition submitted.
Main Document
Jan 13 2022Motion of Alonzo Cortez Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tessa Lynn Henry
    Counsel of Record
State of Oklahoma Office of the Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

tessa.henry@oag.ok.gov
4055224394
Party name: Jimmy Martin
Attorneys for Respondent
James L. Hankins
    Counsel of Record
Hankins Law Office
Mon Abri Business Center
2524 N. Broadway
Edmond, OK 73034

jameshankins@ocdw.com
405-753-4150
Party name: Alonzo Cortez Johnson