No. 21-887
Title:Miguel Luna Perez, Petitioner
v.
Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2021
Linked with 21A74
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1076)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 29, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Application (21A74) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 27, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Application (21A74) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 13, 2021.
Dec 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Mark C. Weber and Bernard P. Perlmutter filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. and National Federation for the Blind filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Brief amici curiae of 23 Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 02 2022Response Requested. (Due March 4, 2022)
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2022 to April 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 4, 2022.
Mar 21 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2022 to May 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 4, 2022.
May 04 2022Brief of respondents Sturgis Public Schools, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
May 24 2022Reply of petitioner Miguel Luna Perez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Sturgis Public Schools, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Miguel Luna Perez filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2022Petition GRANTED.
Oct 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Miguel Luna Perez
Blanket Consent
Oct 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 09 2022Brief of petitioner Miguel Luna Perez filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2022SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 18, 2023.
Nov 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Nov 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Cover to be corrected - 11/23/22)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Senator Tom Harkin, Representative Tony Coelho, Representative George Miller filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of The ARC of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Department of Education Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Brief amici curiae of Advocates for Children of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 28 2022Amicus brief of United States submitted.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 07 2022CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Miguel Luna Perez
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Kenneth Bennett ChapieGiarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.
101 W. Big Beaver, 10th Floor
Troy, MI 48084

kchapie@gmhlaw.com
248-457-7048
Party name: Sturgis Public Schools, et al.
Other
Jeffrey Scott Ginsberg
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jginsberg@pbwt.com
212-336-2000
Party name: Advocates for Children of New York and New York Legal Assistance Group
Sarah Marie Konsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block Supreme Court and Appellate Clinic
University of Chicago Law School
1111 E. 60th Street
Chicago, IL 60637

konsky@uchicago.edu
773-834-3190
Party name: Senator Tom Harkin, Representative Tony Coelho, Representative George Miller
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267921
Party name: Former U.S. Department of Education Officials
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Leslie Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Cardozo Bet Tzedek legal Serv.
55 Fifth Avenue - 11th Floor
New York, NY 10003

salzman@yu.edu
646-592-6570
Party name: Professors
Leslie Salzman
    Counsel of Record
Cardozo Bet Tzedek legal Serv.
55 Fifth Avenue - 11th Floor
New York, NY 10003

salzman@yu.edu
646-592-6570
Party name: 23 Law Professors
Selene Almazan-Altobelli
    Counsel of Record
Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.
PO Box 6767
Towson, MD 21285

selene@copaa.org
(844) 426-7224
Party name: Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. and National Federation for the Blind
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW, Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
2026616582
Party name: Mark C. Weber; Bernard P. Perlmutter